E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR283
|
Journal Page: 6920
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6417
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1647
|
Journal Page: 6416
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6326
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR3047
|
Journal Page: 6322
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6901
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5028
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1104
|
Journal Page: 5025
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4907
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2644
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2644
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2466
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2466
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2466
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3807
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3807
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3807
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3437
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2328
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Shapiro
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
Rule 2, Section 1(a)(9)
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2109
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#408
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
42-Hartnett
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
92-C. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
43-C. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
43-C. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
90-Rose
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
89-Olivo
|
Journal Page: 2104
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amended
|
88-Solomons
|
Journal Page: 2103
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
69-Olivo
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2032
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 585
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|