House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5978
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5978
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4101
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4101
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3908
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3908
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3908
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5068
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1374
|
Journal Page: 5068
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 5049
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3018
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3018
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3018
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3018
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 3018
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Nelson
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Motion to suspend three day rule fails
|
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 3001
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA15 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA3 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 2972
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2972
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2238
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3099
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#731
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
19-Giddings
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
20-Paxton
|
Journal Page: 3098
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
19-Giddings
|
Journal Page: 3097
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amended
|
18-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 3097
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
.
|
Journal Page: 3097
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
12-Giddings
|
Journal Page: 3087
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3085
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3083
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3082
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/11/09 11:45 AM
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2968
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2968
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
180-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2968
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
183-Fletcher
|
Journal Page: 2967
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
180-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
179-Corte
|
Journal Page: 2960
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
123-W. Smith
|
Journal Page: 2960
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
173-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2959
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
172-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 2955
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Resumed consideration
|
|
Journal Page: 2875
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2861
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
105-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 2860
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Motion to table fails
|
105-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 2860
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
106-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 2860
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
105-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 2859
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
103-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2859
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
104-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 2859
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2849
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#671
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
102-Ortiz and Elkins
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
57-Leibowitz
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
98-W. Smith
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
94-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
69-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2818
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2765
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/7/09 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2728
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2728
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|