E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6279
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1636
|
Journal Page: 6278
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6277
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6899
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5001
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4853
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4596
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4596
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5822
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5822
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5822
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2889
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2015
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#389
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#361
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1970
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/27/09 3:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 725
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 725
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|