Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3076 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3076


 AN ACT
 relating to a parenting and paternity awareness program used in the
 health curriculum for public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (p) and adding Subsections (p-2), (p-3), and
 (p-4) to read as follows:
 (p) The State Board of Education, in conjunction with the
 office of the attorney general, shall develop a parenting and
 paternity awareness program that a school district shall use in the
 district's high school health curriculum. A school district may
 use the program developed under this subsection in the district's
 middle or junior high school curriculum. At the discretion of the
 district, a teacher may modify the suggested sequence and pace of
 the program at any grade level. The program must:
 (1) address parenting skills and responsibilities,
 including child support and other legal rights and responsibilities
 that come with parenthood;
 (2) address relationship skills, including money
 management, communication skills, and marriage preparation; and
 (3) in district middle, junior high, or high schools
 that do not have a family violence prevention program, address
 skills relating to the prevention of family violence.
 (p-2)  A school district may develop or adopt research-based
 programs and curriculum materials for use in conjunction with the
 program developed under Subsection (p).  The programs and
 curriculum materials may provide instruction in:
 (1) child development;
 (2)  parenting skills, including child abuse and
 neglect prevention; and
 (3)  assertiveness skills to prevent teenage
 pregnancy, abusive relationships, and family violence.
 (p-3)  The agency shall evaluate programs and curriculum
 materials developed under Subsection (p-2) and distribute to other
 school districts information regarding those programs and
 materials.
 (p-4)  A student under 14 years of age may not participate in
 a program developed under Subsection (p) without the permission of
 the student's parent or person standing in parental relation to the
 student.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2009-2010
 school year.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3076 was passed by the House on April
 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3076 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3076 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 103,
 Nays 37, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3076 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays
 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3076 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor