E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4308
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2598
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#602
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2597
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/6/09 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2495
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 737
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 737
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|