Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3145 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 81R11050 TRH-D
22 By: Gonzalez Toureilles H.B. No. 3145
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the goal for renewable energy capacity derived from
88 renewable energy technologies other than sources using wind energy.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Section 39.904, Utilities Code, is amended by
1111 amending Subsections (a), (b), (c), (d), and (o) and adding
1212 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
1313 (a) It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
1414 2015, an additional 5,000 megawatts of generating capacity from
1515 renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this
1616 state. The cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state
1717 shall total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and the commission
1818 shall establish a goal [target] of 10,000 megawatts of installed
1919 renewable capacity by January 1, 2020 [2025]. The cumulative
2020 installed renewable capacity in this state shall total 2,280
2121 megawatts by January 1, 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009,
2222 4,264 megawatts by January 1, 2011, 5,256 megawatts by January 1,
2323 2013, and 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015.
2424 (a-1) It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
2525 2020, the commission shall establish a goal of an additional 4,000
2626 megawatts [Of the renewable energy technology generating capacity
2727 installed to meet the goal of this subsection after September 1,
2828 2005, the commission shall establish a target of having at least 500
2929 megawatts] of capacity from a combination of renewable energy
3030 technology other than a source using wind energy and small-scale
3131 wind-powered generating installations with a capacity of less than
3232 150 kilowatts each. The cumulative installed capacity to comply
3333 with this subsection in this state shall total 500 megawatts by
3434 January 1, 2012, 2,000 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and 4,000
3535 megawatts by January 1, 2020.
3636 (b) The commission shall establish a renewable energy
3737 credits trading program. Any retail electric provider, municipally
3838 owned utility, or electric cooperative that does not satisfy the
3939 requirements of Subsections [Subsection] (a) and (a-1) by directly
4040 owning or purchasing capacity using renewable energy technologies
4141 shall purchase sufficient renewable energy credits to satisfy the
4242 requirements by holding renewable energy credits in lieu of
4343 capacity from renewable energy technologies.
4444 (c) Not later than January 1, 2000, the commission shall
4545 adopt rules necessary to administer and enforce Subsection (a), and
4646 not later than January 1, 2010, the commission shall adopt rules
4747 necessary to administer and enforce Subsection (a-1) [this
4848 section]. At a minimum, the rules shall:
4949 (1) establish the minimum annual renewable energy
5050 requirement for each retail electric provider, municipally owned
5151 utility, and electric cooperative operating in this state in a
5252 manner reasonably calculated by the commission to produce, on a
5353 statewide basis, compliance with the requirement prescribed by
5454 Subsection (a) and the requirement prescribed by Subsection (a-1);
5555 and
5656 (2) specify reasonable performance standards that all
5757 renewable capacity additions must meet to count against the
5858 requirement prescribed by Subsection (a) and the requirement
5959 prescribed by Subsection (a-1) and that:
6060 (A) are designed and operated so as to maximize
6161 the energy output from the capacity additions in accordance with
6262 then-current industry standards; and
6363 (B) encourage the development, construction, and
6464 operation of new renewable energy projects at those sites in this
6565 state that have the greatest economic potential for capture and
6666 development of this state's environmentally beneficial renewable
6767 resources.
6868 (d) In this section:
6969 (1) "Renewable energy technology" [, "renewable
7070 energy technology"] means any technology that exclusively relies on
7171 an energy source that is naturally regenerated over a short time and
7272 derived directly from the sun, indirectly from the sun, or from
7373 moving water or other natural movements and mechanisms of the
7474 environment. Renewable energy technologies include those that rely
7575 on energy derived directly from the sun, on wind, geothermal,
7676 hydroelectric, wave, or tidal energy, or on renewable biomass or
7777 renewable biomass-based waste products, including landfill gas. A
7878 renewable energy technology does not rely on energy resources
7979 derived from fossil fuels, waste products from fossil fuels, or
8080 waste products from inorganic sources.
8181 (2) "Renewable biomass or renewable biomass-based
8282 waste product" means:
8383 (A) planted crops and crop residue harvested from
8484 agricultural land cleared or cultivated at any time before the
8585 enactment of this subsection that is either actively managed or
8686 fallow, and non-forested;
8787 (B) planted trees and tree residue from actively
8888 managed tree plantations on nonfederal land cleared at any time
8989 before the enactment of this subsection, including land belonging
9090 to an Indian tribe or Indian individual, that is held in trust by
9191 the United States or subject to a restriction against alienation
9292 imposed by the United States;
9393 (C) animal waste material and animal byproducts;
9494 (D) slash and pre-commercial thinning of
9595 nonfederal forestlands, including forestlands belonging to an
9696 Indian tribe or an Indian individual that are held in trust by the
9797 United States or subject to a restriction against alienation
9898 imposed by the United States, but not forests or forestlands that
9999 are ecological communities with a global or state ranking of
100100 critically imperiled, imperiled, or rare pursuant to a state
101101 natural heritage program, old-growth forest, or late successional
102102 forest;
103103 (E) biomass obtained from the immediate vicinity
104104 of buildings and other areas regularly occupied by people or public
105105 infrastructures at risk from wildfire;
106106 (F) algae; and
107107 (G) separated yard or food waste including
108108 recycled cooking and trap grease.
109109 (o) The commission may establish an alternative compliance
110110 payment. An entity that has a renewable energy purchase
111111 requirement under this section may elect to pay the alternative
112112 compliance payment instead of applying renewable energy credits
113113 toward the satisfaction of the entity's obligation under this
114114 section. The commission may establish a separate alternative
115115 compliance payment for the goal of 500 megawatts of capacity from
116116 renewable energy technologies other than wind energy. [The
117117 alternative compliance payment for a renewable energy purchase
118118 requirement that could be satisfied with a renewable energy credit
119119 from wind energy may not be less than $2.50 per credit or greater
120120 than $20 per credit. Prior to September 1, 2009, an alternative
121121 compliance payment under this subsection may not be set above $5 per
122122 credit. In implementing this subsection, the commission shall
123123 consider:
124124 [(1) the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
125125 retail competition;
126126 [(2) the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
127127 electric rates;
128128 [(3) the effect of the alternative compliance payment
129129 level on the renewable energy credit market; and
130130 [(4) any other factors necessary to ensure the
131131 continued development of the renewable energy industry in this
132132 state while protecting ratepayers from unnecessary rate
133133 increases.]
134134 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
135135 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
136136 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
137137 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
138138 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.