Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3145 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R11050 TRH-D
 By: Gonzalez Toureilles H.B. No. 3145


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the goal for renewable energy capacity derived from
 renewable energy technologies other than sources using wind energy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.904, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), (c), (d), and (o) and adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a) It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
 2015, an additional 5,000 megawatts of generating capacity from
 renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this
 state. The cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state
 shall total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and the commission
 shall establish a goal [target] of 10,000 megawatts of installed
 renewable capacity by January 1, 2020 [2025]. The cumulative
 installed renewable capacity in this state shall total 2,280
 megawatts by January 1, 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009,
 4,264 megawatts by January 1, 2011, 5,256 megawatts by January 1,
 2013, and 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015.
 (a-1)  It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
 2020, the commission shall establish a goal of an additional 4,000
 megawatts [Of the renewable energy technology generating capacity
 installed to meet the goal of this subsection after September 1,
 2005, the commission shall establish a target of having at least 500
 megawatts] of capacity from a combination of renewable energy
 technology other than a source using wind energy and small-scale
 wind-powered generating installations with a capacity of less than
 150 kilowatts each. The cumulative installed capacity to comply
 with this subsection in this state shall total 500 megawatts by
 January 1, 2012, 2,000 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and 4,000
 megawatts by January 1, 2020.
 (b) The commission shall establish a renewable energy
 credits trading program. Any retail electric provider, municipally
 owned utility, or electric cooperative that does not satisfy the
 requirements of Subsections [Subsection] (a) and (a-1) by directly
 owning or purchasing capacity using renewable energy technologies
 shall purchase sufficient renewable energy credits to satisfy the
 requirements by holding renewable energy credits in lieu of
 capacity from renewable energy technologies.
 (c) Not later than January 1, 2000, the commission shall
 adopt rules necessary to administer and enforce Subsection (a), and
 not later than January 1, 2010, the commission shall adopt rules
 necessary to administer and enforce Subsection (a-1) [this
 section]. At a minimum, the rules shall:
 (1) establish the minimum annual renewable energy
 requirement for each retail electric provider, municipally owned
 utility, and electric cooperative operating in this state in a
 manner reasonably calculated by the commission to produce, on a
 statewide basis, compliance with the requirement prescribed by
 Subsection (a) and the requirement prescribed by Subsection (a-1);
 and
 (2) specify reasonable performance standards that all
 renewable capacity additions must meet to count against the
 requirement prescribed by Subsection (a) and the requirement
 prescribed by Subsection (a-1) and that:
 (A) are designed and operated so as to maximize
 the energy output from the capacity additions in accordance with
 then-current industry standards; and
 (B) encourage the development, construction, and
 operation of new renewable energy projects at those sites in this
 state that have the greatest economic potential for capture and
 development of this state's environmentally beneficial renewable
 resources.
 (d) In this section:
 (1) "Renewable energy technology" [, "renewable
 energy technology"] means any technology that exclusively relies on
 an energy source that is naturally regenerated over a short time and
 derived directly from the sun, indirectly from the sun, or from
 moving water or other natural movements and mechanisms of the
 environment. Renewable energy technologies include those that rely
 on energy derived directly from the sun, on wind, geothermal,
 hydroelectric, wave, or tidal energy, or on renewable biomass or
 renewable biomass-based waste products, including landfill gas. A
 renewable energy technology does not rely on energy resources
 derived from fossil fuels, waste products from fossil fuels, or
 waste products from inorganic sources.
 (2)  "Renewable biomass or renewable biomass-based
 waste product" means:
 (A)  planted crops and crop residue harvested from
 agricultural land cleared or cultivated at any time before the
 enactment of this subsection that is either actively managed or
 fallow, and non-forested;
 (B)  planted trees and tree residue from actively
 managed tree plantations on nonfederal land cleared at any time
 before the enactment of this subsection, including land belonging
 to an Indian tribe or Indian individual, that is held in trust by
 the United States or subject to a restriction against alienation
 imposed by the United States;
 (C) animal waste material and animal byproducts;
 (D)  slash and pre-commercial thinning of
 nonfederal forestlands, including forestlands belonging to an
 Indian tribe or an Indian individual that are held in trust by the
 United States or subject to a restriction against alienation
 imposed by the United States, but not forests or forestlands that
 are ecological communities with a global or state ranking of
 critically imperiled, imperiled, or rare pursuant to a state
 natural heritage program, old-growth forest, or late successional
 forest;
 (E)  biomass obtained from the immediate vicinity
 of buildings and other areas regularly occupied by people or public
 infrastructures at risk from wildfire;
 (F) algae; and
 (G)  separated yard or food waste including
 recycled cooking and trap grease.
 (o) The commission may establish an alternative compliance
 payment. An entity that has a renewable energy purchase
 requirement under this section may elect to pay the alternative
 compliance payment instead of applying renewable energy credits
 toward the satisfaction of the entity's obligation under this
 section. The commission may establish a separate alternative
 compliance payment for the goal of 500 megawatts of capacity from
 renewable energy technologies other than wind energy. [The
 alternative compliance payment for a renewable energy purchase
 requirement that could be satisfied with a renewable energy credit
 from wind energy may not be less than $2.50 per credit or greater
 than $20 per credit.     Prior to September 1, 2009, an alternative
 compliance payment under this subsection may not be set above $5 per
 credit.     In implementing this subsection, the commission shall
 consider:
 [(1)     the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 retail competition;
 [(2)     the effect of renewable energy credit prices on
 electric rates;
 [(3)     the effect of the alternative compliance payment
 level on the renewable energy credit market; and
 [(4)     any other factors necessary to ensure the
 continued development of the renewable energy industry in this
 state while protecting ratepayers from unnecessary rate
 increases.]
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.