1 | 1 | | 81R28550 JAM-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Davis of Dallas H.B. No. 3161 |
---|
3 | 3 | | Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3161: |
---|
4 | 4 | | By: Pierson C.S.H.B. No. 3161 |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to the administration of the Texas Department of Housing |
---|
10 | 10 | | and Community Affairs. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is |
---|
13 | 13 | | amended by adding Section 2306.058 to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 2306.058. TRANSITION PLAN FOR CERTAIN POWERS, DUTIES, |
---|
15 | 15 | | AND PROGRAMS; RULES. (a) The director by rule shall adopt a |
---|
16 | 16 | | transition plan for the department's assumption of the former |
---|
17 | 17 | | powers and duties of the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation |
---|
18 | 18 | | under Section 2306.551. The transition plan must: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) include a timetable with specific steps and |
---|
20 | 20 | | deadlines needed to fully complete the transfer; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) ensure that the transfer is fully implemented not |
---|
22 | 22 | | later than January 1, 2010. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) The director may adopt rules necessary to improve the |
---|
24 | 24 | | efficiency or effectiveness of any program that is transferred to |
---|
25 | 25 | | the department as a result of the department's assumption of the |
---|
26 | 26 | | former powers and duties of the Texas State Affordable Housing |
---|
27 | 27 | | Corporation under Section 2306.551, including rules that provide |
---|
28 | 28 | | for consolidating the operation of programs already administered by |
---|
29 | 29 | | the department and a program or programs that are transferred to the |
---|
30 | 30 | | department from the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation. |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is |
---|
32 | 32 | | amended by adding Section 2306.0725 to read as follows: |
---|
33 | 33 | | Sec. 2306.0725. STUDY OF EFFECTIVENESS OF STATE LOW INCOME |
---|
34 | 34 | | HOUSING PLAN. (a) The department shall conduct a study regarding |
---|
35 | 35 | | the effectiveness of the annual state low income housing plan under |
---|
36 | 36 | | Section 2306.0721 in efficiently allocating all available housing |
---|
37 | 37 | | resources and reducing or eliminating redundant allocations of |
---|
38 | 38 | | housing resources. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (b) The study must examine and provide recommendations |
---|
40 | 40 | | regarding strategies for increasing the efficiency of the state low |
---|
41 | 41 | | income housing plan. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (c) Not later than December 1, 2010, the department shall |
---|
43 | 43 | | submit a report regarding the results of the study to the |
---|
44 | 44 | | legislature. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (d) This section expires September 2, 2011. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter Y, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is |
---|
47 | 47 | | amended by amending Section 2306.551 and adding Section 2306.5511 |
---|
48 | 48 | | to read as follows: |
---|
49 | 49 | | Sec. 2306.551. TRANSFER OF CORPORATION POWERS AND DUTIES |
---|
50 | 50 | | AND ASSETS. (a) The powers and duties of the corporation under |
---|
51 | 51 | | this chapter or other law are transferred to the Texas Department of |
---|
52 | 52 | | Housing and Community Affairs. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (b) The corporation shall transfer to the Texas Department |
---|
54 | 54 | | of Housing and Community Affairs: |
---|
55 | 55 | | (1) all assets owned or distributed by the |
---|
56 | 56 | | corporation, including any real or personal property owned by the |
---|
57 | 57 | | corporation and any bond revenue distributed by the corporation; |
---|
58 | 58 | | (2) all records related to the operation of any home |
---|
59 | 59 | | loan programs under this chapter; and |
---|
60 | 60 | | (3) any applications pending with the corporation on |
---|
61 | 61 | | the date the corporation is dissolved by the board of the |
---|
62 | 62 | | corporation. |
---|
63 | 63 | | (c) The board of the corporation shall: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (1) take all necessary actions to dissolve the |
---|
65 | 65 | | corporation; and |
---|
66 | 66 | | (2) at the request of the director, assist the |
---|
67 | 67 | | director in formulating the transition plan under Section 2306.058. |
---|
68 | 68 | | Sec. 2306.5511. DEFINITION; CONSTRUCTION OF OTHER LAW. (a) |
---|
69 | 69 | | In this subchapter, "corporation" means the Texas State Affordable |
---|
70 | 70 | | Housing Corporation. |
---|
71 | 71 | | (b) A reference in law to the corporation is a reference to |
---|
72 | 72 | | the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 4. Sections 2306.255(g) and 2306.552, Government |
---|
74 | 74 | | Code, are repealed. |
---|
75 | 75 | | SECTION 5. (a) The Texas State Affordable Housing |
---|
76 | 76 | | Corporation is abolished on January 1, 2010. |
---|
77 | 77 | | (b) All powers, duties, obligations, rights, contracts, |
---|
78 | 78 | | funds, unspent appropriations, records, real or personal property, |
---|
79 | 79 | | and personnel of the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation |
---|
80 | 80 | | shall be transferred to the Texas Department of Housing and |
---|
81 | 81 | | Community Affairs not later than January 1, 2010. |
---|
82 | 82 | | (c) A policy, procedure, or decision of the Texas State |
---|
83 | 83 | | Affordable Housing Corporation relating to a duty of that |
---|
84 | 84 | | corporation that is transferred to the authority of the Texas |
---|
85 | 85 | | Department of Housing and Community Affairs under Section 2306.551, |
---|
86 | 86 | | Government Code, as amended by this Act, continues in effect as a |
---|
87 | 87 | | policy, procedure, or decision of the Texas Department of Housing |
---|
88 | 88 | | and Community Affairs until superseded by an act of the director of |
---|
89 | 89 | | the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs. |
---|
90 | 90 | | (d) Except as otherwise provided by this Act, the validity |
---|
91 | 91 | | of a plan or procedure adopted, contract or acquisition made, |
---|
92 | 92 | | proceeding begun, grant or loan awarded, obligation incurred, right |
---|
93 | 93 | | accrued, or other action taken by or in connection with the |
---|
94 | 94 | | authority of the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation before |
---|
95 | 95 | | that corporation is abolished under Subsection (a) of this section |
---|
96 | 96 | | is not affected by the abolishment. |
---|
97 | 97 | | (e) The director of the Texas Department of Housing and |
---|
98 | 98 | | Community Affairs shall adopt rules relating to the transfer of the |
---|
99 | 99 | | programs assigned to the Texas Department of Housing and Community |
---|
100 | 100 | | Affairs under Section 2306.551, Government Code, as amended by this |
---|
101 | 101 | | Act, not later than October 1, 2009. |
---|
102 | 102 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
103 | 103 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
104 | 104 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
105 | 105 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
106 | 106 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|