Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3161 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R28550 JAM-D
 By: Davis of Dallas H.B. No. 3161
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3161:
 By: Pierson C.S.H.B. No. 3161


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of the Texas Department of Housing
 and Community Affairs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.058 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.058.  TRANSITION PLAN FOR CERTAIN POWERS, DUTIES,
 AND PROGRAMS; RULES. (a)  The director by rule shall adopt a
 transition plan for the department's assumption of the former
 powers and duties of the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation
 under Section 2306.551. The transition plan must:
 (1)  include a timetable with specific steps and
 deadlines needed to fully complete the transfer; and
 (2)  ensure that the transfer is fully implemented not
 later than January 1, 2010.
 (b)  The director may adopt rules necessary to improve the
 efficiency or effectiveness of any program that is transferred to
 the department as a result of the department's assumption of the
 former powers and duties of the Texas State Affordable Housing
 Corporation under Section 2306.551, including rules that provide
 for consolidating the operation of programs already administered by
 the department and a program or programs that are transferred to the
 department from the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.0725 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.0725.  STUDY OF EFFECTIVENESS OF STATE LOW INCOME
 HOUSING PLAN. (a)  The department shall conduct a study regarding
 the effectiveness of the annual state low income housing plan under
 Section 2306.0721 in efficiently allocating all available housing
 resources and reducing or eliminating redundant allocations of
 housing resources.
 (b)  The study must examine and provide recommendations
 regarding strategies for increasing the efficiency of the state low
 income housing plan.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2010, the department shall
 submit a report regarding the results of the study to the
 legislature.
 (d) This section expires September 2, 2011.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter Y, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by amending Section 2306.551 and adding Section 2306.5511
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.551. TRANSFER OF CORPORATION POWERS AND DUTIES
 AND ASSETS.  (a)  The powers and duties of the corporation under
 this chapter or other law are transferred to the Texas Department of
 Housing and Community Affairs.
 (b)  The corporation shall transfer to the Texas Department
 of Housing and Community Affairs:
 (1)  all assets owned or distributed by the
 corporation, including any real or personal property owned by the
 corporation and any bond revenue distributed by the corporation;
 (2)  all records related to the operation of any home
 loan programs under this chapter; and
 (3)  any applications pending with the corporation on
 the date the corporation is dissolved by the board of the
 corporation.
 (c) The board of the corporation shall:
 (1)  take all necessary actions to dissolve the
 corporation; and
 (2)  at the request of the director, assist the
 director in formulating the transition plan under Section 2306.058.
 Sec. 2306.5511. DEFINITION; CONSTRUCTION OF OTHER LAW. (a)
 In this subchapter, "corporation" means the Texas State Affordable
 Housing Corporation.
 (b)  A reference in law to the corporation is a reference to
 the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
 SECTION 4. Sections 2306.255(g) and 2306.552, Government
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 5. (a) The Texas State Affordable Housing
 Corporation is abolished on January 1, 2010.
 (b) All powers, duties, obligations, rights, contracts,
 funds, unspent appropriations, records, real or personal property,
 and personnel of the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation
 shall be transferred to the Texas Department of Housing and
 Community Affairs not later than January 1, 2010.
 (c) A policy, procedure, or decision of the Texas State
 Affordable Housing Corporation relating to a duty of that
 corporation that is transferred to the authority of the Texas
 Department of Housing and Community Affairs under Section 2306.551,
 Government Code, as amended by this Act, continues in effect as a
 policy, procedure, or decision of the Texas Department of Housing
 and Community Affairs until superseded by an act of the director of
 the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
 (d) Except as otherwise provided by this Act, the validity
 of a plan or procedure adopted, contract or acquisition made,
 proceeding begun, grant or loan awarded, obligation incurred, right
 accrued, or other action taken by or in connection with the
 authority of the Texas State Affordable Housing Corporation before
 that corporation is abolished under Subsection (a) of this section
 is not affected by the abolishment.
 (e) The director of the Texas Department of Housing and
 Community Affairs shall adopt rules relating to the transfer of the
 programs assigned to the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs under Section 2306.551, Government Code, as amended by this
 Act, not later than October 1, 2009.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.