Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3186 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3186


 AN ACT
 relating to the collection and use of biometric identifiers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 503.001, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsections (c-1) and
 (c-2) to read as follows:
 (c) A person who possesses a biometric identifier of an
 individual that is captured for a commercial purpose:
 (1) may not sell, lease, or otherwise disclose the
 biometric identifier to another person unless:
 (A) the individual consents to the disclosure for
 identification purposes in the event of the individual's
 disappearance or death;
 (B) the disclosure completes a financial
 transaction that the individual requested or authorized;
 (C) the disclosure is required or permitted by a
 federal statute or by a state statute other than Chapter 552,
 Government Code; or
 (D) the disclosure is made by or to a law
 enforcement agency for a law enforcement purpose in response to a
 warrant; [and]
 (2) shall store, transmit, and protect from disclosure
 the biometric identifier using reasonable care and in a manner that
 is the same as or more protective than the manner in which the
 person stores, transmits, and protects any other confidential
 information the person possesses; and
 (3)  shall destroy the biometric identifier within a
 reasonable time, but not later than the first anniversary of the
 date the purpose for collecting the identifier expires, except as
 provided by Subsection (c-1).
 (c-1)  If a biometric identifier of an individual captured
 for a commercial purpose is used in connection with an instrument or
 document that is required by another law to be maintained for a
 period longer than the period prescribed by Subsection (c)(3), the
 person who possesses the biometric identifier shall destroy the
 biometric identifier within a reasonable time, but not later than
 the first anniversary of the date the instrument or document is no
 longer required to be maintained by law.
 (c-2)  If a biometric identifier captured for a commercial
 purpose has been collected for security purposes by an employer,
 the purpose for collecting the identifier under Subsection (c)(3)
 is presumed to expire on termination of the employment
 relationship.
 SECTION 2. (a) The changes in law made by this Act apply to
 a biometric identifier possessed by a person:
 (1) on or after the effective date of this Act; or
 (2) before the effective date of this Act, subject to
 Subsection (b) of this section.
 (b) A person who before the effective date of this Act
 possesses a biometric identifier that is required to be destroyed
 because of the changes in law made by this Act shall destroy the
 biometric identifier on or before October 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3186 was passed by the House on May
 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3186 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3186 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor