House | 05/14/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3663 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1878 | Journal Page: 3662 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 10:00 PM | Journal Page: 3531 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3531 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3249 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3248 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Postponed | 5/12/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2616 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2615 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Postponed | 5/6/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2522 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2522 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 747 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |