E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6970
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5067
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5067
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1669
|
Journal Page: 6529
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6527
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4957
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4741
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4741
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5338
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5338
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5338
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5132
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2313
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#760
|
Journal Page: 3230
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3230
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3229
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3161
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3161
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 3160
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Madden
|
Journal Page: 3160
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3160
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 747
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 747
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|