Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3224 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3224


 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution and punishment of the offense of arson.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 28.02, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (a-2) and amending Subsections (f) and (g) to read as
 follows:
 (a-2)  A person commits an offense if the person
 intentionally starts a fire or causes an explosion and in so doing:
 (1)  recklessly damages or destroys a building
 belonging to another; or
 (2)  recklessly causes another person to suffer bodily
 injury or death.
 (f) An offense under Subsection (a-2) is a state jail felony
 [It is a felony of the third degree if a person commits an offense
 under Subsection (a)(2) of this section and the person
 intentionally starts a fire in or on a building, habitation, or
 vehicle, with intent to damage or destroy property belonging to
 another, or with intent to injure any person, and in so doing,
 recklessly causes damage to the building, habitation, or vehicle].
 (g) If conduct that constitutes an offense under Subsection
 (a-1) or that constitutes an offense under Subsection (a-2) [(f)]
 also constitutes an offense under another subsection of this
 section or another section of this code, the actor may be prosecuted
 under Subsection (a-1) or Subsection (a-2) [(f)], under the other
 subsection of this section, or under the other section of this code.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3224 was passed by the House on May
 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 5, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3224 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3224 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3224 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3224 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor