Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3224 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Madden (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 3224
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009;
 May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3224 By: Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution and punishment of the offense of arson.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 28.02, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (a-2) and (h) and amending Subsections (f) and (g) to
 read as follows:
 (a-2)  A person commits an offense if the person
 intentionally starts a fire or causes an explosion and in so doing:
 (1)  recklessly damages or destroys a building
 belonging to another; or
 (2)  recklessly causes another person to suffer bodily
 injury or death.
 (f) An offense under Subsection (a-2) is a state jail felony
 [It is a felony of the third degree if a person commits an offense
 under Subsection (a)(2) of this section and the person
 intentionally starts a fire in or on a building, habitation, or
 vehicle, with intent to damage or destroy property belonging to
 another, or with intent to injure any person, and in so doing,
 recklessly causes damage to the building, habitation, or vehicle].
 (g) If conduct that constitutes an offense under Subsection
 (a-1) or that constitutes an offense under Subsection (a-2) [(f)]
 also constitutes an offense under another subsection of this
 section or another section of this code, the actor may be prosecuted
 under Subsection (a-1) or Subsection (a-2) [(f)], under the other
 subsection of this section, or under the other section of this code.
 (h)  With the consent of the appropriate local county or
 district attorney, the attorney general has concurrent
 jurisdiction with that consenting local prosecutor to prosecute an
 offense under this section.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *