House | 05/12/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3193 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB2134 | Journal Page: 3193 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 749 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 749 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |