Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#645
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amended
|
1-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2661
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#616
|
Journal Page: 2661
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Motion to table fails
|
1-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2661
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/6/09 4:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 2615
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 2615
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/6/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 18
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2493
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 751
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 751
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|