1 | 1 | | By: Howard of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 3276 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2009; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
4 | 4 | | Education; May 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; |
---|
6 | 6 | | May 21, 2009, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3276 By: Patrick |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to a study of priorities for awards of TEXAS grants. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter M, Chapter 56, Education Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 56.309 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 56.309. STUDY OF PRIORITIES FOR AWARD OF TEXAS GRANTS. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (a) The Legislative Budget Board, in consultation with the |
---|
18 | 18 | | coordinating board, shall conduct a study to identify and recommend |
---|
19 | 19 | | methods of prioritizing the award of TEXAS grants to eligible |
---|
20 | 20 | | students to ensure the most effective use of money available under |
---|
21 | 21 | | the program. The study must include an examination of the effects |
---|
22 | 22 | | of prioritizing the award of grants: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) based on the financial need of students; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2) in a manner designed to provide an incentive for |
---|
25 | 25 | | students to meet college readiness standards, including successful |
---|
26 | 26 | | performance on assessment instruments under Section 51.3062. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2010, the Legislative Budget |
---|
28 | 28 | | Board shall report the results of the study to the governor, |
---|
29 | 29 | | lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and |
---|
30 | 30 | | presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with |
---|
31 | 31 | | primary jurisdiction over higher education. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (c) This section expires January 31, 2011. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
34 | 34 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
35 | 35 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
36 | 36 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
37 | 37 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
38 | 38 | | * * * * * |
---|