Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3276 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R23543 JRJ-F
 By: Howard of Travis H.B. No. 3276
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3276:
 By: Howard of Travis C.S.H.B. No. 3276


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of student priority in awarding TEXAS
 grants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 56.303, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (e) and (e-1) to
 read as follows:
 (d) In determining who should receive a TEXAS grant, the
 coordinating board [and the eligible institutions] shall give
 highest priority to awarding TEXAS grants to students who
 demonstrate the greatest financial need.
 (e)  In determining who should receive a TEXAS grant, each
 eligible institution shall give highest priority to awarding TEXAS
 grants to students who:
 (1) demonstrate the greatest financial need; and
 (2)  beginning with grants awarded for the 2012-2013
 academic year, meet, exceed, or receive an exemption from the
 standards developed for assessment instruments designed to assess a
 student's readiness to perform freshman-level academic coursework
 under Section 51.3062.
 (e-1)  For the 2012-2013 academic year and for grants awarded
 for the 2013-2014 academic year before September 30, 2013, each
 eligible institution shall give priority under Subsection (e)(2) to
 a student who meets, exceeds, or is exempt from the current
 standards developed under Section 51.3062 or from the standards
 developed under Section 51.3062 as they existed on January 1, 2009.
 This subsection expires December 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.