Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3276 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Howard of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 3276
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2009;
 May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3276 By: Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study of priorities for awards of TEXAS grants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter M, Chapter 56, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 56.309 to read as follows:
 Sec. 56.309.  STUDY OF PRIORITIES FOR AWARD OF TEXAS GRANTS.
 (a) The Legislative Budget Board, in consultation with the
 coordinating board, shall conduct a study to identify and recommend
 methods of prioritizing the award of TEXAS grants to eligible
 students to ensure the most effective use of money available under
 the program. The study must include an examination of the effects
 of prioritizing the award of grants:
 (1) based on the financial need of students; and
 (2)  in a manner designed to provide an incentive for
 students to meet college readiness standards, including successful
 performance on assessment instruments under Section 51.3062.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2010, the Legislative Budget
 Board shall report the results of the study to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and
 presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with
 primary jurisdiction over higher education.
 (c) This section expires January 31, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *