Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3276 Senate Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS     Senate Research Center C.S.H.B. 3276 81R35154 JRJ-F By: Howard, Donna (Ellis)  Higher Education  5/20/2009  Committee Report (Substituted)     AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   C.S.H.B. 3276 amends current law relating to a study of priorities for awards of Toward Excellence, Access, & Success (TEXAS) grants.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter M, Chapter 56, Education Code, by adding Section 56.309, as follows:   Sec. 56.309. STUDY OF PRIORITIES FOR AWARD OF TEXAS GRANTS. (a) Requires the Legislative Budget Board (LBB), in consultation with the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, to conduct a study to identify and recommend methods of prioritizing the award of Toward Excellence, Access, & Success (TEXAS) grants to eligible students to ensure the most effective use of money available under the program. Requires that the study include an examination of the effects of prioritizing the award of grants based on the financial need of students, and in a manner designed to provide an incentive for students to meet college readiness standards, including successful performance on assessment instruments under Section 51.3062 (Success Initiative).    (b) Requires LBB, not later than December 1, 2010, to report the results of the study to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education.   (c) Provides that this section expires January 31, 2011.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.     

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center C.S.H.B. 3276

81R35154 JRJ-F By: Howard, Donna (Ellis)

 Higher Education

 5/20/2009

 Committee Report (Substituted)

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

C.S.H.B. 3276 amends current law relating to a study of priorities for awards of Toward Excellence, Access, & Success (TEXAS) grants.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter M, Chapter 56, Education Code, by adding Section 56.309, as follows:

 

Sec. 56.309. STUDY OF PRIORITIES FOR AWARD OF TEXAS GRANTS. (a) Requires the Legislative Budget Board (LBB), in consultation with the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, to conduct a study to identify and recommend methods of prioritizing the award of Toward Excellence, Access, & Success (TEXAS) grants to eligible students to ensure the most effective use of money available under the program. Requires that the study include an examination of the effects of prioritizing the award of grants based on the financial need of students, and in a manner designed to provide an incentive for students to meet college readiness standards, including successful performance on assessment instruments under Section 51.3062 (Success Initiative). 

 

(b) Requires LBB, not later than December 1, 2010, to report the results of the study to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education.

 

(c) Provides that this section expires January 31, 2011.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2009.