Senate | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2725 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2105 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2586 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | RV#593 | Journal Page: 2586 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2586 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2586 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2522 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Amended | 1-Solomons | Journal Page: 2522 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2522 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1661 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 754 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 754 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |