Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3314 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Hinojsa) H.B. No. 3314
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2009;
 May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of title to a decedent's homestead through
 a small estate affidavit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 137(c), Texas Probate Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c) Title to a decedent's homestead that is the only real
 property in the [a] decedent's estate may be transferred on an
 affidavit that meets the requirements of this section only to a
 distributee who is the decedent's child or who occupied the
 property as the distributee's principal residence on the date of
 the decedent's death, provided that the distributee is otherwise
 entitled to the property. An affidavit that is used to transfer
 title to a homestead under this section must be recorded in the deed
 records of a county in which the homestead is located. A bona fide
 purchaser for value may rely on a recorded affidavit under this
 section. A bona fide purchaser for value without actual or
 constructive notice of an heir who is not disclosed in a recorded
 affidavit under this section acquires title to a homestead free of
 the interests of the undisclosed heir, but the bona fide purchaser
 remains subject to any claim a creditor of the decedent has by law.
 A purchaser has constructive notice of an heir who is not disclosed
 in a recorded affidavit under this section if an affidavit,
 judgment of heirship, or title transaction in the chain of title in
 the deed records identifies the heir of the decedent who is not
 disclosed in the affidavit as an heir of the decedent. An heir who
 is not disclosed in a recorded affidavit under this section may
 recover from an heir who receives consideration from a purchaser in
 a transfer for value of title to a homestead passing under the
 affidavit.
 SECTION 2. Section 137(c), Texas Probate Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies to the estate of a decedent that is pending on
 or after the effective date of this Act, regardless of the
 decedent's date of death.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *