Senate | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2144 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3042 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | RV#620 | Journal Page: 2691 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2691 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2691 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2684 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2684 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 757 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 757 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |