Senate | 05/23/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#1059 | Journal Page: 4346 |
House | 05/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 4346 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4346 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4346 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4345 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4345 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules | Journal Page: 4326 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 4322 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Amended | 1-Chisum | Journal Page: 4322 |
House | 05/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4322 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2870 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |