Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3150
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2458
|
House
|
05/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3730
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#877
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3694
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|