E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6976 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4986 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6027 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6903 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5202 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3291 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3291 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3291 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3291 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3291 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3291 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3291 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2562 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1378 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#223 | Journal Page: 1684 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1684 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1684 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1675 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1675 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 778 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 778 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |