Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3447 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 20, 2009      TO: Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3447 by Rodriguez (Relating to a study of the effectiveness for junior college students of the success initiative assessment and developmental coursework requirements regarding student readiness for college-level work.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3447, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($333,612) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 20, 2009





  TO: Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3447 by Rodriguez (Relating to a study of the effectiveness for junior college students of the success initiative assessment and developmental coursework requirements regarding student readiness for college-level work.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3447 by Rodriguez (Relating to a study of the effectiveness for junior college students of the success initiative assessment and developmental coursework requirements regarding student readiness for college-level work.), As Introduced

 Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education 

 Honorable Dan Branch, Chair, House Committee on Higher Education 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3447 by Rodriguez (Relating to a study of the effectiveness for junior college students of the success initiative assessment and developmental coursework requirements regarding student readiness for college-level work.), As Introduced

HB3447 by Rodriguez (Relating to a study of the effectiveness for junior college students of the success initiative assessment and developmental coursework requirements regarding student readiness for college-level work.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3447, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($333,612) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3447, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($333,612) through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 ($178,405)   2011 ($155,207)   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0    


2010 ($178,405)
2011 ($155,207)
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($178,405)   2011 ($155,207)   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2010 ($178,405)   2011 ($155,207)   2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0  


2010 ($178,405)
2011 ($155,207)
2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0

   Fiscal Year Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 2.0   2011 2.0   2012 0.0   2013 0.0   2014 0.0   Fiscal Analysis Under provisions of the bill, the Higher Education Coordinating Board would be required to study the effectiveness of the Texas Success Initiative as applied to students enrolled in public junior college. The Board would be required to submit their findings to the legislature no later than November 1, 2010. The provision would expire on January 1, 2011. Methodology The Higher Education Coordinating Board has indicated that they would need to hire two additional FTE's, one program director to handle the reporting changes, programming issues, and working with colleges on the changes in the reporting requirements, and one research specialist to design the studies, analyze results, and make recommendations to the institutions and legislature. The estimated cost to general revenue for the additional personnel is $178,406 for fiscal year 2010 and $155,207 for fiscal year 2011 for salaries and benefits. Since the provision expires in fiscal year 2011, there are no costs for fiscal year 2012-2014. 

  Fiscal Year Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 2.0   2011 2.0   2012 0.0   2013 0.0   2014 0.0  


2010 2.0
2011 2.0
2012 0.0
2013 0.0
2014 0.0

Fiscal Analysis

Under provisions of the bill, the Higher Education Coordinating Board would be required to study the effectiveness of the Texas Success Initiative as applied to students enrolled in public junior college. The Board would be required to submit their findings to the legislature no later than November 1, 2010. The provision would expire on January 1, 2011.

Methodology

The Higher Education Coordinating Board has indicated that they would need to hire two additional FTE's, one program director to handle the reporting changes, programming issues, and working with colleges on the changes in the reporting requirements, and one research specialist to design the studies, analyze results, and make recommendations to the institutions and legislature. The estimated cost to general revenue for the additional personnel is $178,406 for fiscal year 2010 and $155,207 for fiscal year 2011 for salaries and benefits. Since the provision expires in fiscal year 2011, there are no costs for fiscal year 2012-2014.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 781 Higher Education Coordinating Board

781 Higher Education Coordinating Board

LBB Staff: JOB, KK, RT, GO

 JOB, KK, RT, GO