E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4521
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5825
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1507
|
Journal Page: 5825
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5825
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5206
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 3575
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3575
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3575
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3165
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2496
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2399
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#861
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 3517
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3516
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/14/09 1:40 PM
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3427
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3427
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 3427
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Motion to table fails
|
3-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 3427
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
3-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 3427
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 3426
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3426
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/13/09 10:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3420
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 3419
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3419
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|