House | 05/08/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3001 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 2126 | Journal Page: 3000 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Postponed | 5/8/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2523 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2523 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Filed |