Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3594 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3594


 AN ACT
 relating to the preservation of evidence that contains biological
 material.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)(1)  This subsection applies only to evidence described
 by Subsection (b) that was used to prosecute and convict a defendant
 of an offense under Chapter 19, 21, or 22, Penal Code, if on
 conviction of the offense the defendant was sentenced to a term of
 imprisonment of 10 years or more.
 (2)  In a county with a population less than 100,000,
 the attorney representing the state, clerk, or other officer in
 possession of any evidence to which this subsection applies shall
 ensure the preservation of the evidence by promptly delivering the
 evidence to the Department of Public Safety for storage in
 accordance with Section 411.052, Government Code, and department
 rules.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.052 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.052.  PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE CONTAINING
 BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL.  (a)  The department:
 (1)  shall maintain a storage space for the
 preservation of evidence containing biological material that is
 delivered to the department under Article 38.43(f), Code of
 Criminal Procedure; and
 (2)  may maintain a storage space for the preservation
 of evidence of a sexual assault or other sex offense.
 (b)  The department shall adopt rules relating to the
 delivery, cataloging, and preservation of evidence stored under
 this section.
 SECTION 3. (a) The Department of Public Safety of the State
 of Texas shall adopt rules as required by Section 411.052(b),
 Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than November 1,
 2009.
 (b) The Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas
 must begin accepting evidence delivered to the department in
 accordance with Article 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 amended by this Act, and Section 411.052, Government Code, as added
 by this Act, on January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 storage of evidence in the possession of the state during a criminal
 proceeding that commences on or after January 1, 2010. The storage
 of evidence in the possession of the state during a criminal
 proceeding that commences before January 1, 2010, is covered by the
 law in effect when the proceeding commenced, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3594 was passed by the House on May
 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3594 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3594 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor