E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR280
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 280
|
Journal Page: 5105
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 4096
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4133
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
Rule 8, Section 5
|
Journal Page: 5009
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5008
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1372
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5007
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4819
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2950
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2950
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2950
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2950
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2950
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2950
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2949
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 2948
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2948
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2948
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2876
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#350
|
Journal Page: 1962
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1962
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1962
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 791
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 791
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|