Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3613 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3613


 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of the market value of a residence
 homestead for ad valorem tax purposes on the basis of the property's
 value as a residence homestead and to an exemption from ad valorem
 taxation of the residence homesteads of certain totally disabled
 veterans and to the amount of the exemption from ad valorem taxation
 to which a disabled veteran is entitled based on disability rating.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) Subchapter B, Chapter 11, Tax Code, is
 amended by adding Section 11.131 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.131.  RESIDENCE HOMESTEAD OF 100 PERCENT OR TOTALLY
 DISABLED VETERAN.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Disabled veteran" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 11.22.
 (2)  "Residence homestead" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 11.13.
 (b)  A disabled veteran who receives from the United States
 Department of Veterans Affairs or its successor 100 percent
 disability compensation due to a service-connected disability and a
 rating of 100 percent disabled or of individual unemployability is
 entitled to an exemption from taxation of the total appraised value
 of the veteran's residence homestead.
 (b) Subsection (a), Section 11.22, Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) A disabled veteran is entitled to an exemption from
 taxation of a portion of the assessed value of a property the
 veteran owns and designates as provided by Subsection (f) [of this
 section] in accordance with the following schedule:
 an exemption of for a disability rating of
 up to:  at least:  but less [not greater] than: up to:  at least:  but less [not greater] than:
up to:  at least:  but less [not greater] than:
 $5,000 of the  10%  30% $5,000 of the  10%  30%
$5,000 of the  10%  30%
 assessed value assessed value
assessed value
 7,500  30 [31]  50 7,500  30 [31]  50
7,500  30 [31]  50
 10,000  50 [51]  70 10,000  50 [51]  70
10,000  50 [51]  70
 12,000  70 [71] and over 12,000  70 [71] and over
12,000  70 [71] and over
 (c) Subsection (c), Section 11.43, Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c) An exemption provided by Section 11.13, 11.131, 11.17,
 11.18, 11.182, 11.183, 11.19, 11.20, 11.21, 11.22, 11.23(h), (j),
 or (j-1), 11.29, 11.30, or 11.31, once allowed, need not be claimed
 in subsequent years, and except as otherwise provided by Subsection
 (e), the exemption applies to the property until it changes
 ownership or the person's qualification for the exemption changes.
 However, the chief appraiser may require a person allowed one of the
 exemptions in a prior year to file a new application to confirm the
 person's current qualification for the exemption by delivering a
 written notice that a new application is required, accompanied by
 an appropriate application form, to the person previously allowed
 the exemption.
 (d) Subsection (a), Section 11.431, Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) The chief appraiser shall accept and approve or deny an
 application for a residence homestead exemption, including a
 disabled veteran residence homestead exemption, after the deadline
 for filing it has passed if it is filed not later than one year after
 the delinquency date for the taxes on the homestead.
 (e) Section 403.302, Government Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  For purposes of Subsection (d), a residence homestead
 that receives an exemption under Section 11.131, Tax Code, in the
 year that is the subject of the study is not considered to be
 taxable property.
 (f) Section 11.131, Tax Code, as added by this Act, applies
 to a tax year beginning on or after January 1, 2009.
 (g) Notwithstanding any other provision of this Act, this
 section takes effect immediately if this Act receives a vote of
 two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by
 Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not
 receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this section takes
 effect September 1, 2009.
 SECTION 2. Section 23.01, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The market value of a residence homestead shall be
 determined solely on the basis of the property's value as a
 residence homestead, regardless of whether the residential use of
 the property by the owner is considered to be the highest and best
 use of the property.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect only if the constitutional
 amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009,
 authorizing the legislature to provide for the ad valorem taxation
 of a residence homestead solely on the basis of the property's value
 as a residence homestead is approved by the voters. If that
 amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act has no effect.
 SECTION 4. This Act applies only to an ad valorem tax year
 that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3613 was passed by the House on April
 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No.
 3613 on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1
 present, not voting; and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 280
 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 3613 on June 1, 2009, by
 the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3613 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 280 authorizing certain
 corrections in H.B. No. 3613 on June 1, 2009, by the following
 vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor

up to:  at least:  but less [not greater] than:

$5,000 of the  10%  30%

assessed value

7,500  30 [31]  50

10,000  50 [51]  70

12,000  70 [71] and over