1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 3628 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the date by which the executive director of the Texas |
---|
6 | 6 | | Department of Licensing and Regulation must require compliance with |
---|
7 | 7 | | certain elevator safety standards. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 754.014, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by amending Subsection (f) and adding Subsection (f-1) to |
---|
11 | 11 | | read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (f) The executive director shall grant a delay until |
---|
13 | 13 | | September 1, 2012 [2010], for compliance with the requirements for |
---|
14 | 14 | | [door restrictors or] firefighter's service in the ASME Code A17.3 |
---|
15 | 15 | | if those requirements were not included in the ASME Code A17.1 that |
---|
16 | 16 | | was in effect on the date of installation and the equipment was not |
---|
17 | 17 | | subsequently installed. This subsection expires October 1, 2012. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (f-1) The executive director shall grant a delay until |
---|
19 | 19 | | September 1, 2010, for compliance with the requirements for door |
---|
20 | 20 | | restrictors in the ASME Code A17.3. This subsection expires |
---|
21 | 21 | | October 1, 2010. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
23 | 23 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
24 | 24 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
25 | 25 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
26 | 26 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
27 | 27 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
28 | 28 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
29 | 29 | | I certify that H.B. No. 3628 was passed by the House on May |
---|
30 | 30 | | 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
31 | 31 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
32 | 32 | | No. 3628 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, |
---|
33 | 33 | | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
34 | 34 | | ______________________________ |
---|
35 | 35 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
36 | 36 | | I certify that H.B. No. 3628 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
37 | 37 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
38 | 38 | | 1. |
---|
39 | 39 | | ______________________________ |
---|
40 | 40 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
41 | 41 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
42 | 42 | | Date |
---|
43 | 43 | | __________________ |
---|
44 | 44 | | Governor |
---|