H.B. No. 3628 AN ACT relating to the date by which the executive director of the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation must require compliance with certain elevator safety standards. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 754.014, Health and Safety Code, is amended by amending Subsection (f) and adding Subsection (f-1) to read as follows: (f) The executive director shall grant a delay until September 1, 2012 [2010], for compliance with the requirements for [door restrictors or] firefighter's service in the ASME Code A17.3 if those requirements were not included in the ASME Code A17.1 that was in effect on the date of installation and the equipment was not subsequently installed. This subsection expires October 1, 2012. (f-1) The executive director shall grant a delay until September 1, 2010, for compliance with the requirements for door restrictors in the ASME Code A17.3. This subsection expires October 1, 2010. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3628 was passed by the House on May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 3628 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3628 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor