Senate | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1995 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1995 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1881 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#418 | Journal Page: 2178 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2178 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2178 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2113 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Amended | 1-Madden and McReynolds | Journal Page: 2113 |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2113 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 800 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 800 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |