Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3737 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3737


 AN ACT
 relating to criminal history checks for employees of, and
 applicants for employment at, special care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 250, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 250. NURSE AIDE REGISTRY AND CRIMINAL HISTORY CHECKS OF
 EMPLOYEES AND APPLICANTS FOR EMPLOYMENT IN CERTAIN FACILITIES
 SERVING THE ELDERLY, [OR] PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES, OR PERSONS
 WITH TERMINAL ILLNESSES
 SECTION 2. Section 250.001(3), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (3) "Facility" means:
 (A) a nursing home, custodial care home, or other
 institution licensed by the [Texas] Department of Aging and
 Disability [Human] Services under Chapter 242;
 (B) an assisted living facility licensed by the
 [Texas] Department of Aging and Disability [Human] Services under
 Chapter 247;
 (C) a home and community support services agency
 licensed under Chapter 142;
 (D) an adult day care facility licensed by the
 [Texas] Department of Aging and Disability [Human] Services under
 Chapter 103, Human Resources Code;
 (E) a facility for persons with mental
 retardation licensed under Chapter 252;
 (F) an adult foster care provider that contracts
 with the [Texas] Department of Aging and Disability [Human]
 Services;
 (G) a facility that provides mental health
 services and that is operated by or contracts with the [Texas]
 Department of State [Mental] Health Services [and Mental
 Retardation];
 (H) a local mental health or mental retardation
 authority designated under Section 533.035; [or]
 (I) a person exempt from licensing under Section
 142.003(a)(19); or
 (J)  a special care facility licensed by the
 Department of State Health Services under Chapter 248.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3737 was passed by the House on May 6,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3737 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3737 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3737 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3737 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor