E
|
05/23/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
E
|
05/15/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2018
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#392
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Cook
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1999
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 803
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 803
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|