Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 3165 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2714 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2399 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#854 | Journal Page: 3512 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3512 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3512 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3426 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3425 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Amended | 3-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3425 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3424 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2216 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 823 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 823 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |