House
|
05/15/2009
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 3712
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB2307
|
Journal Page: 3712
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3593
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2135
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 824
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 824
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|