Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3864 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3864


 AN ACT
 relating to the acceptance of certain donated building projects by
 the Parks and Wildlife Department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 11, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 11.0285 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.0285.  DONATED BUILDING PROJECTS. (a) The department
 may accept the donation of a turnkey building project on state land
 provided that the department:
 (1) approves the plans and engineering in advance; and
 (2) has supervision over the project.
 (b)  A project under this section is not subject to
 competitive bidding.
 (c)  The commission may adopt rules to implement this
 section.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3864 was passed by the House on May
 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3864 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3864 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3864 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3864 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor