E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/29/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6040 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5114 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3168 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3168 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3168 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3168 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3168 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3168 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3168 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1067 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1276 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#151 | Journal Page: 1222 |
House | 04/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1222 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1222 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1213 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1213 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 969 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 12/10/2008 | Filed |