1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 392 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the availability and use of automated external |
---|
6 | 6 | | defibrillators in nursing homes and related institutions. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 242, Health and Safety |
---|
9 | 9 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 242.159 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 242.159. AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATORS. (a) An |
---|
11 | 11 | | institution shall have available for use at the institution an |
---|
12 | 12 | | automated external defibrillator, as defined by Section 779.001, |
---|
13 | 13 | | and shall comply with the training, use, and notification |
---|
14 | 14 | | requirements of Chapter 779. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (b) An institution that does not have funds available for |
---|
16 | 16 | | purposes of Subsection (a) may solicit gifts, grants, or donations |
---|
17 | 17 | | to purchase or maintain an automated external defibrillator for use |
---|
18 | 18 | | at the institution. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (c) The use of an automated external defibrillator must be |
---|
20 | 20 | | consistent with a resident's advance directive executed or issued |
---|
21 | 21 | | under Subchapter C, Chapter 166. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (d) Notwithstanding Section 74.151(b), Civil Practice and |
---|
23 | 23 | | Remedies Code, Section 74.151(a), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, |
---|
24 | 24 | | applies to administration of emergency care using an automated |
---|
25 | 25 | | external defibrillator by an employee or volunteer at an |
---|
26 | 26 | | institution. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (e) An institution shall employ at least one person who is |
---|
28 | 28 | | trained in the proper use of an automated external defibrillator. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (e-1) An institution is not required to comply with |
---|
30 | 30 | | Subsections (a) and (e) until September 1, 2012. This subsection |
---|
31 | 31 | | expires January 1, 2013. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
33 | 33 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
34 | 34 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
35 | 35 | | I certify that H.B. No. 392 was passed by the House on April |
---|
36 | 36 | | 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
37 | 37 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
38 | 38 | | No. 392 on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2 |
---|
39 | 39 | | present, not voting. |
---|
40 | 40 | | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | 41 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
42 | 42 | | I certify that H.B. No. 392 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
43 | 43 | | amendments, on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
44 | 44 | | 0. |
---|
45 | 45 | | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | 46 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
47 | 47 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
48 | 48 | | Date |
---|
49 | 49 | | __________________ |
---|
50 | 50 | | Governor |
---|