Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB392 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 392


 AN ACT
 relating to the availability and use of automated external
 defibrillators in nursing homes and related institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.159 to read as follows:
 Sec. 242.159.  AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATORS. (a)  An
 institution shall have available for use at the institution an
 automated external defibrillator, as defined by Section 779.001,
 and shall comply with the training, use, and notification
 requirements of Chapter 779.
 (b)  An institution that does not have funds available for
 purposes of Subsection (a) may solicit gifts, grants, or donations
 to purchase or maintain an automated external defibrillator for use
 at the institution.
 (c)  The use of an automated external defibrillator must be
 consistent with a resident's advance directive executed or issued
 under Subchapter C, Chapter 166.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Section 74.151(b), Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, Section 74.151(a), Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 applies to administration of emergency care using an automated
 external defibrillator by an employee or volunteer at an
 institution.
 (e)  An institution shall employ at least one person who is
 trained in the proper use of an automated external defibrillator.
 (e-1)  An institution is not required to comply with
 Subsections (a) and (e) until September 1, 2012.  This subsection
 expires January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 392 was passed by the House on April
 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 392 on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 392 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor