Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3932 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R5827 ACP/CBH-F
 By: Harper-Brown H.B. No. 3932


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a road user fee pilot program by
 the Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 222, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter F to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER F. ROAD USER FEE PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 222.151. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Diesel fuel" has the meaning assigned by Section
 162.001, Tax Code.
 (2)  "Gasoline" has the meaning assigned by Section
 162.001, Tax Code.
 (3)  "Program" means a road user fee pilot program
 established under this subchapter.
 Sec. 222.152.  PROGRAM ESTABLISHED. (a) Except as provided
 by Subsection (b), the department by rule shall establish a pilot
 program in at least one county that is part of a regional mobility
 authority established or operating under Chapter 370 to study the
 feasibility of assessing a road user fee that is based on the number
 of miles traveled in this state by a motor vehicle.
 (b)  The department may not establish the program in a county
 without the approval of the commissioners court of that county.
 Sec. 222.153.  AMOUNT OF ROAD USER FEE.  (a)  The department
 by rule shall set the amount of the road user fee on a per mile
 basis.
 (b)  In prescribing the amount of the fee, the department
 shall determine the average amount of taxes imposed under Chapter
 162, Tax Code, per mile on gasoline or diesel fuel used to propel an
 average motor vehicle over the public roadways of this state.
 (c)  The department shall set the fee in an amount equal to
 the amount determined under Subsection (b).
 (d)  The department shall allow a person who participates in
 the program a credit against the fee imposed for use of a motor
 vehicle equal to the amount of any taxes paid under Chapter 162,
 Tax Code, for gasoline or diesel fuel used in the vehicle during the
 period on which the amount of the fee paid is based.
 Sec. 222.154.  DEPOSIT OF NET REVENUE. The department shall
 deposit the net revenue from the fee imposed under this subchapter
 to the credit of the state highway fund.
 Sec. 222.155.  ELIGIBILITY. In establishing the pilot
 program, the department shall consult with the regional mobility
 authority of which the county is a part to develop criteria for
 voluntary program participation. The criteria must include
 requirements that a person must:
 (1)  reside in a county that is participating in the
 program;
 (2)  possess a valid driver's license issued to that
 person by this state;
 (3)  own a motor vehicle that is registered in this
 state; and
 (4) agree to rules adopted by the department.
 Sec. 222.156.  CONTRACTS. The department may contract with
 the regional mobility authority of which the county is a part or The
 Texas A&M University System, or both, to implement or administer
 all or any part of the program.
 Sec. 222.157.  PROMOTION OF PROGRAM. Notwithstanding
 Chapter 2113, Government Code, the department or an entity with
 which the department contracts under Section 222.156 may promote
 the program by appropriate means, including advertising or
 marketing as the department or the entity determines appropriate.
 Sec. 222.158.  REPORT. Not later than January 31, 2012, the
 department shall submit to the legislature a report that includes
 recommendations regarding:
 (1)  the feasibility of assessing a road user fee that
 is based on the number of miles traveled in this state by a motor
 vehicle; and
 (2)  legislation to implement a road user fee in this
 state.
 Sec. 222.159.  EXPIRATION.  This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. Not later than December 31, 2010, the Texas
 Department of Transportation shall establish a pilot program as
 required by Section 222.152, Transportation Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.