E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2639
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1040
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4245
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3950
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2105
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#582
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2569
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hancock
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 835
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|