Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3951 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 3951


 AN ACT
 relating to requiring a public institution of higher education to
 designate or employ a person trained in student financial
 assistance programs for military veterans and their families.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 56, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 56.006 to read as follows:
 Sec. 56.006.  EMPLOYEE TRAINED IN STUDENT FINANCIAL
 ASSISTANCE PROGRAMS FOR VETERANS AND FAMILIES. (a)  Each
 institution of higher education shall ensure that one or more
 persons employed by the institution is trained:
 (1)  in understanding state and federal student
 financial assistance programs available to military veterans or
 their family members, especially programs specifically applicable
 to military veterans or their family members; and
 (2)  in assisting military veterans and eligible family
 members in understanding and obtaining the benefits available under
 those programs.
 (b)  A person described by Subsection (a) must be available
 to assist persons as described by Subsection (a)(2) during regular
 business hours at the financial aid or other office to which the
 person is assigned.
 SECTION 2. A public institution of higher education shall
 comply with Section 56.006, Education Code, as added by this Act,
 concerning employment of a person to provide student financial
 assistance for military veterans and their families not later than
 January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3951 was passed by the House on May 6,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 109, Nays 36, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3951 on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 1,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3951 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor