By: Turner of Tarrant, Leibowitz, Moody H.B. No. 3951 (Senate Sponsor - Davis) (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2009; May 8, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; May 13, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 13, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to requiring a public institution of higher education to designate or employ a person trained in student financial assistance programs for military veterans and their families. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 56, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 56.006 to read as follows: Sec. 56.006. EMPLOYEE TRAINED IN STUDENT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE PROGRAMS FOR VETERANS AND FAMILIES. (a) Each institution of higher education shall ensure that one or more persons employed by the institution is trained: (1) in understanding state and federal student financial assistance programs available to military veterans or their family members, especially programs specifically applicable to military veterans or their family members; and (2) in assisting military veterans and eligible family members in understanding and obtaining the benefits available under those programs. (b) A person described by Subsection (a) must be available to assist persons as described by Subsection (a)(2) during regular business hours at the financial aid or other office to which the person is assigned. (c) The legislature shall ensure that each institution receives adequate funding to cover the additional costs attributable to the requirements of this section and may appropriate money for that purpose. SECTION 2. A public institution of higher education shall comply with Section 56.006, Education Code, as added by this Act, concerning employment of a person to provide student financial assistance for military veterans and their families not later than January 1, 2010. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *