1 | 1 | | 81R8374 TJS-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Hunter H.B. No. 3972 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the election of certain members of the board of trustees |
---|
8 | 8 | | of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 821.001(5), Government Code, is amended |
---|
11 | 11 | | to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (5) "Board of trustees" means the board appointed or |
---|
13 | 13 | | elected under this subtitle to administer the retirement system. |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 825, Government Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 825.0021 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 825.0021. ELECTED TRUSTEES. (a) The retirement |
---|
17 | 17 | | system shall provide for the direct election of two persons to serve |
---|
18 | 18 | | on the board of trustees who are former members of the retirement |
---|
19 | 19 | | system who have retired and are receiving benefits from the |
---|
20 | 20 | | retirement system, and who shall be elected by former members of the |
---|
21 | 21 | | retirement system who have retired and are receiving benefits from |
---|
22 | 22 | | the retirement system. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) The two persons elected under Subsection (a) hold office |
---|
24 | 24 | | for staggered terms. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (c) The board of trustees by rule shall adopt procedures to |
---|
26 | 26 | | implement this section. The procedures must include a method for |
---|
27 | 27 | | filling a vacancy in an elected position. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 3. Sections 825.0032(a) and (b), Government Code, |
---|
29 | 29 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), a person is not |
---|
31 | 31 | | eligible for appointment or election to the board if the person or |
---|
32 | 32 | | the person's spouse: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) is employed by or participates in the management |
---|
34 | 34 | | of a business entity or other organization receiving funds from the |
---|
35 | 35 | | retirement system; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) owns or controls, directly or indirectly, more |
---|
37 | 37 | | than a 10 percent interest in a business entity or other |
---|
38 | 38 | | organization receiving funds from the retirement system; or |
---|
39 | 39 | | (3) uses or receives a substantial amount of tangible |
---|
40 | 40 | | goods, services, or funds from the retirement system, other than |
---|
41 | 41 | | compensation or reimbursement authorized by law for board |
---|
42 | 42 | | membership, attendance, or expenses. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (b) Subsection (a) does not apply to employment by, |
---|
44 | 44 | | participation in the management of, or ownership or control of an |
---|
45 | 45 | | interest in a business entity or other organization on behalf of the |
---|
46 | 46 | | retirement system. Subsection (a)(3) does not apply to a person who |
---|
47 | 47 | | is nominated for appointment under Section 825.002(c), (d), or (e) |
---|
48 | 48 | | or elected under Section 825.0021. |
---|
49 | 49 | | SECTION 4. Sections 825.0041(a) and (c), Government Code, |
---|
50 | 50 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (a) A person who is appointed or elected to and qualifies |
---|
52 | 52 | | for office as a member of the board of trustees may not vote, |
---|
53 | 53 | | deliberate, or be counted as a member in attendance at a meeting of |
---|
54 | 54 | | the board until the person completes a training program that |
---|
55 | 55 | | complies with this section. |
---|
56 | 56 | | (c) A person appointed or elected to the board of trustees |
---|
57 | 57 | | is entitled to reimbursement under Section 825.007 for the travel |
---|
58 | 58 | | expenses incurred in attending the training program regardless of |
---|
59 | 59 | | whether the attendance at the program occurs before or after |
---|
60 | 60 | | the person qualifies for office. |
---|
61 | 61 | | SECTION 5. Section 825.009(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
62 | 62 | | to read as follows: |
---|
63 | 63 | | (a) A trustee appointed from a slate of members nominated by |
---|
64 | 64 | | members of the retirement system under Section 825.002 or elected |
---|
65 | 65 | | by members of the retirement system under Section 825.0021 is |
---|
66 | 66 | | entitled to leave with pay from the trustee's public school |
---|
67 | 67 | | employer to attend to the official business of the retirement |
---|
68 | 68 | | system. |
---|
69 | 69 | | SECTION 6. Sections 825.010(a) and (c), Government Code, |
---|
70 | 70 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
71 | 71 | | (a) It is a ground for removal from the board that a trustee: |
---|
72 | 72 | | (1) does not have at the time of taking office the |
---|
73 | 73 | | qualifications required for the trustee's position; |
---|
74 | 74 | | (2) does not maintain during service on the board the |
---|
75 | 75 | | qualifications required for the trustee's position; |
---|
76 | 76 | | (3) violates a prohibition established by Section |
---|
77 | 77 | | 825.002(b) or 825.0032; |
---|
78 | 78 | | (4) cannot because of illness or disability discharge |
---|
79 | 79 | | the trustee's duties for a substantial part of the term for which |
---|
80 | 80 | | the trustee is appointed or elected; or |
---|
81 | 81 | | (5) is absent from more than half of the regularly |
---|
82 | 82 | | scheduled board meetings that the person is eligible to attend |
---|
83 | 83 | | during a calendar year without an excuse approved by a majority vote |
---|
84 | 84 | | of the board. |
---|
85 | 85 | | (c) If the executive director has knowledge that a potential |
---|
86 | 86 | | ground for removal exists, the executive director shall notify the |
---|
87 | 87 | | presiding officer of the board of the ground. The presiding officer |
---|
88 | 88 | | shall then notify the appropriate appointing officer, if any, and |
---|
89 | 89 | | the attorney general that a potential ground for removal exists. If |
---|
90 | 90 | | the potential ground for removal involves the presiding officer, |
---|
91 | 91 | | the executive director shall notify the next highest officer of the |
---|
92 | 92 | | board, who shall notify the appropriate appointing officer, if any, |
---|
93 | 93 | | and the attorney general that a potential ground for removal |
---|
94 | 94 | | exists. |
---|
95 | 95 | | SECTION 7. Section 825.003, Government Code, is repealed. |
---|
96 | 96 | | SECTION 8. (a) In this section, "board" means the board of |
---|
97 | 97 | | trustees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas. |
---|
98 | 98 | | (b) The board shall adopt procedures to implement Section |
---|
99 | 99 | | 825.0021(a), Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than |
---|
100 | 100 | | December 31, 2009. |
---|
101 | 101 | | (c) The procedures adopted by the board shall facilitate the |
---|
102 | 102 | | elections required under Section 825.0021(a), Government Code, as |
---|
103 | 103 | | added by this Act, so that the first elections are conducted not |
---|
104 | 104 | | later than May 1, 2010. |
---|
105 | 105 | | (d) A person elected at the first election under Section |
---|
106 | 106 | | 825.0021(a), Government Code, as added by this Act, shall serve a |
---|
107 | 107 | | term beginning as soon as practicable after the date of the election |
---|
108 | 108 | | and taking the oath of office. One person elected under Section |
---|
109 | 109 | | 825.0021(a) shall serve a term that expires August 31, 2013, and the |
---|
110 | 110 | | other person elected under Section 825.0021(a) shall serve a term |
---|
111 | 111 | | that expires August 31, 2015, as determined according to the |
---|
112 | 112 | | board's procedures adopted under Section 825.0021(c), Government |
---|
113 | 113 | | Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
114 | 114 | | (e) Not later than the 10th day after the date of the first |
---|
115 | 115 | | election held under Section 825.0021, Government Code, as added by |
---|
116 | 116 | | this Act, the board shall post the election results on the Teacher |
---|
117 | 117 | | Retirement System of Texas publicly accessible Internet website. |
---|
118 | 118 | | SECTION 9. The term of a person serving on the board of |
---|
119 | 119 | | trustees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas on December 1, |
---|
120 | 120 | | 2009, and who was appointed to that position under Section 825.003, |
---|
121 | 121 | | Government Code, before the repeal of that section by this Act |
---|
122 | 122 | | expires on the date on which a person elected to serve on the board |
---|
123 | 123 | | at the first election held under Section 825.0021, Government Code, |
---|
124 | 124 | | as added by this Act, takes the oath of office. |
---|
125 | 125 | | SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|