Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB3972 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R8374 TJS-D
 By: Hunter H.B. No. 3972


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of certain members of the board of trustees
 of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 821.001(5), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (5) "Board of trustees" means the board appointed or
 elected under this subtitle to administer the retirement system.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 825, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 825.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 825.0021.  ELECTED TRUSTEES. (a)  The retirement
 system shall provide for the direct election of two persons to serve
 on the board of trustees who are former members of the retirement
 system who have retired and are receiving benefits from the
 retirement system, and who shall be elected by former members of the
 retirement system who have retired and are receiving benefits from
 the retirement system.
 (b)  The two persons elected under Subsection (a) hold office
 for staggered terms.
 (c)  The board of trustees by rule shall adopt procedures to
 implement this section. The procedures must include a method for
 filling a vacancy in an elected position.
 SECTION 3. Sections 825.0032(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), a person is not
 eligible for appointment or election to the board if the person or
 the person's spouse:
 (1) is employed by or participates in the management
 of a business entity or other organization receiving funds from the
 retirement system;
 (2) owns or controls, directly or indirectly, more
 than a 10 percent interest in a business entity or other
 organization receiving funds from the retirement system; or
 (3) uses or receives a substantial amount of tangible
 goods, services, or funds from the retirement system, other than
 compensation or reimbursement authorized by law for board
 membership, attendance, or expenses.
 (b) Subsection (a) does not apply to employment by,
 participation in the management of, or ownership or control of an
 interest in a business entity or other organization on behalf of the
 retirement system. Subsection (a)(3) does not apply to a person who
 is nominated for appointment under Section 825.002(c), (d), or (e)
 or elected under Section 825.0021.
 SECTION 4. Sections 825.0041(a) and (c), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a) A person who is appointed or elected to and qualifies
 for office as a member of the board of trustees may not vote,
 deliberate, or be counted as a member in attendance at a meeting of
 the board until the person completes a training program that
 complies with this section.
 (c) A person appointed or elected to the board of trustees
 is entitled to reimbursement under Section 825.007 for the travel
 expenses incurred in attending the training program regardless of
 whether the attendance at the program occurs before or after
 the person qualifies for office.
 SECTION 5. Section 825.009(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) A trustee appointed from a slate of members nominated by
 members of the retirement system under Section 825.002 or elected
 by members of the retirement system under Section 825.0021 is
 entitled to leave with pay from the trustee's public school
 employer to attend to the official business of the retirement
 system.
 SECTION 6. Sections 825.010(a) and (c), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a) It is a ground for removal from the board that a trustee:
 (1) does not have at the time of taking office the
 qualifications required for the trustee's position;
 (2) does not maintain during service on the board the
 qualifications required for the trustee's position;
 (3) violates a prohibition established by Section
 825.002(b) or 825.0032;
 (4) cannot because of illness or disability discharge
 the trustee's duties for a substantial part of the term for which
 the trustee is appointed or elected; or
 (5) is absent from more than half of the regularly
 scheduled board meetings that the person is eligible to attend
 during a calendar year without an excuse approved by a majority vote
 of the board.
 (c) If the executive director has knowledge that a potential
 ground for removal exists, the executive director shall notify the
 presiding officer of the board of the ground. The presiding officer
 shall then notify the appropriate appointing officer, if any, and
 the attorney general that a potential ground for removal exists. If
 the potential ground for removal involves the presiding officer,
 the executive director shall notify the next highest officer of the
 board, who shall notify the appropriate appointing officer, if any,
 and the attorney general that a potential ground for removal
 exists.
 SECTION 7. Section 825.003, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 8. (a) In this section, "board" means the board of
 trustees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
 (b) The board shall adopt procedures to implement Section
 825.0021(a), Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 December 31, 2009.
 (c) The procedures adopted by the board shall facilitate the
 elections required under Section 825.0021(a), Government Code, as
 added by this Act, so that the first elections are conducted not
 later than May 1, 2010.
 (d) A person elected at the first election under Section
 825.0021(a), Government Code, as added by this Act, shall serve a
 term beginning as soon as practicable after the date of the election
 and taking the oath of office. One person elected under Section
 825.0021(a) shall serve a term that expires August 31, 2013, and the
 other person elected under Section 825.0021(a) shall serve a term
 that expires August 31, 2015, as determined according to the
 board's procedures adopted under Section 825.0021(c), Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 (e) Not later than the 10th day after the date of the first
 election held under Section 825.0021, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, the board shall post the election results on the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas publicly accessible Internet website.
 SECTION 9. The term of a person serving on the board of
 trustees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas on December 1,
 2009, and who was appointed to that position under Section 825.003,
 Government Code, before the repeal of that section by this Act
 expires on the date on which a person elected to serve on the board
 at the first election held under Section 825.0021, Government Code,
 as added by this Act, takes the oath of office.
 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.