E | 05/27/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/27/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5217 | |
E | 05/19/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4221 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2534 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3970 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3717 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2405 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2405 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2405 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2405 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2405 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1995 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1995 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1759 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2217 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2023 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Record vote | RV#396 | Journal Page: 2022 |
House | 04/29/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2022 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2022 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2000 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2000 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1148 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 839 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 839 | |
House | 03/12/2009 | Filed |